+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 80 (Ch. 2017-21)
- Substituted CS/CS/SB 80
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/17
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/06/17, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Government Accountability Committee
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
- CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- PCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
- Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 03/08/17, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 119.12 - Attorney’s fees.