+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2020-44
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Messages
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Substituted for CS/SB 68
- Received
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Morris Hall
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Now in Health and Human Services Committee
- Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On October 24, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On October 17, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 10/24/19, 9:30 am, 12 HOB
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
On September 13, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- 420.507 - Powers of the corporation.
- 420.621 - Definitions.
- 420.622 - State Office on Homelessness; Council on Homelessness.
- 420.6225 -
- 420.6227 -
- 420.623 - Local coalitions for the homeless.
- 420.624 - Local homeless assistance continuum of care.
- 420.625 - Grant-in-aid program.
- 420.626 - Homelessness; discharge guidelines.
- 420.6265 - Rapid ReHousing.
- 420.6275 - Housing First.
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2020: Floor vote: H 163 Filed
- Yeas: 38
March 9, 2020: Floor vote: H 163 Filed
- Yeas: 118
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor