+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 29, 2022 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2022-263
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
- Approved by Governor
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Withdrawn from Rules
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- In Messages
- Ordered enrolled
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Local Calendar, 03/10/22
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- In Messages
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 107, NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/24/2022)
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- Bill released to House Calendar
- Reported out of State Affairs Committee
- Favorable by State Affairs Committee
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Now in State Affairs Committee
- Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
- Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
On January 16, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
- Referred to State Affairs Committee
- Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2022: Floor vote: H 1591 Filed
- Yeas: 39
February 25, 2022: Floor vote: H 1591 Filed
- Yeas: 107
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor