+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2015-104
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Substituted for CS/SB 1116
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
- In Messages
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (606917)
- Placed on 3rd reading
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/19/15, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Education Committee
- Favorable by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/12/15, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Choice and Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Education Appropriations Subcommittee
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Choice and Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Choice and Innovation Subcommittee, 02/03/15, 1:30 pm, 306 HOB
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Choice and Innovation Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
On December 29, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
606917 - Amendment
Remove lines 44-45 and insert:
159917 - Amendment
Remove lines 69-82 and insert:
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2015: Floor vote: H 0153 e1
- Yeas: 39
April 24, 2015: Floor vote: H 0153 e1
- Yeas: 116
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor