+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 722 (Ch. 2022-143)
- Substituted CS/SB 722
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- Bill released to House Calendar
- Reported out of Judiciary Committee
- Favorable by Judiciary Committee
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
- Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
- Favorable by Education & Employment Committee
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Education & Employment Committee
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
- Now in Education & Employment Committee
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
- Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
On January 16, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
- Referred to Education & Employment Committee
- Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendment
877057 - Amendment (Adopted 2/3/2022)
Remove lines 44-48 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor