+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Died in Commerce Committee
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Commerce Committee
- Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
- Favorable by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
- Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
- Favorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda
On January 16, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
- Referred to Commerce Committee
- Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
- Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor