+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Substituted SB 474
- Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 474 (Ch. 2022-93)
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- Bill released to House Calendar
- Reported out of Commerce Committee
- Favorable by Commerce Committee
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Commerce Committee agenda
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
- Now in Commerce Committee
- Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On September 29, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
- Referred to Commerce Committee
- Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
On September 21, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor