+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1445 (Ch. 2022-86), SB 7026 (Ch. 2022-145)
- Substituted SB 7026
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Reported out of State Affairs Committee
- Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- PCS added to State Affairs Committee agenda
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
- Now in State Affairs Committee
- Referred to State Affairs Committee
- Original reference removed: Health & Human Services Committee
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with CS by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
- CS Filed
- Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
- Reported out of Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
- Favorable by Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda
On January 16, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
- Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
- Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
- Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendment
455611 - Amendment (Adopted 2/15/2022)
Remove line 88 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 110.12301 - Competitive procurement of postpayment claims review services and dependent eligibility verification services; public records exemption.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor