+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable by- Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 02/25/16, 10:00 am, Webster Hall
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
- CS by Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 02/18/16, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Now in Economic Affairs Committee
- Favorable by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 02/01/16, 11:30 am, Webster Hall
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
234949 - Amendment
Remove lines 12-24
308521 - Amendment
Remove line 20 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 1974-570 - Section 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor