+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/17
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/13/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
- Now in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendment
551573 - Amendment
Remove lines 24-34 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 787.061 -
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor