+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/17/16, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Now in Education Committee
- Favorable by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/09/16, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Now in Education Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by K-12 Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- K-12 Subcommittee, 02/01/16, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to K-12 Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 1003.44 - Patriotic programs; rules.