+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
On January 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Statute Amended
- 1009.265 - State employee fee waivers.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor