+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2013-267
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Withdrawn from Rules
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Messages
- Referred to Rules
- Placed on Local Calendar, 04/30/13
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/13
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/28/13, 10:30 am, Reed Hall
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Economic Affairs Committee
- Favorable by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/22/13, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Economic Affairs Committee
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2013: Senate floor vote on H 1367
- Yeas: 36
April 30, 2013: Floor Vote: Senate
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor