+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (43)
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2020-27
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 101 NAYS 10
- Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (573190)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- In returning messages
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 998
- Amendment(s) adopted (573190)
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Community Affairs; Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations
- In Messages
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 119 NAYS 0
- Amendment(s) adopted (023483)
- Read 3rd time
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (292409, 945829)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
- Placed on Calendar
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- CS/CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
On March 1, 2020 in the House:
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- CS/CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Now in Commerce Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- CS/CS by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
- CS/CS by Ways and Means Committee read 1st time
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 02/19/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Now in Ways and Means Committee
- CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 02/03/20, 3:00 pm, 12 HOB
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 10, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendments (16)
274667 - Strike All Amendment (Adopted without Objection 2/3/2020)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
594225 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 2/20/2020)
Remove lines 231-248
422983 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 2/20/2020)
Remove lines 357-392 and insert:
218225 - Amendment (Adopted 2/20/2020)
Between lines 676 and 677, insert:
634515 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 2/20/2020)
Remove lines 1182-1192 and insert:
386787 - Strike All Amendment (Adopted without Objection 2/27/2020)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
668177 - Amendment (House: Withdrawn 3/4/2020)
Remove line 202 and insert:
545697 - Amendment (House: Withdrawn 3/5/2020)
Between lines 1754 and 1755, insert:
945829 - Strike All Amendment (House: Adopted as Amended 3/6/2020)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
292409 - Amendment to Amendment (945829) (House: Adopted 3/6/2020)
Remove line 142 of the amendment and insert:
023483 - Technical Amendment (House: Adopted 3/9/2020)
Remove lines 802-818 and insert:
105450 - Amendment (Delete All) (Senate: Replaced by Engrossed Amendment 3/10/2020)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
780448 - Amendment to Amendment (105450) (Senate: Withdrawn 3/10/2020)
Delete lines 5 - 158 and insert:
215652 - Amendment to Amendment (105450) (Senate: Withdrawn 3/10/2020)
Delete lines 5 - 158 and insert:
191524 - Amendment to Amendment (105450) (Senate: Replaced by Engrossed Amendment 3/10/2020)
Delete lines 5 - 158 and insert:
573190 - Amendment (Delete All) (House: Concur 3/13/2020)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (35)
- 125.01055 - Affordable housing.
- 129.03 - Preparation and adoption of budget.
- 163.01 - Florida Interlocal Cooperation Act of 1969.
- 163.31771 - Accessory dwelling units.
- 163.31801 - Impact fees; short title; intent; minimum requirements; audits; challenges.
- 166.04151 - Affordable housing.
- 166.241 - Fiscal years, budgets, and budget amendments.
- 193.018 - Land owned by a community land trust used to provide affordable housing; assessment; structural improvements, condominium parcels, and cooperative parcels.
- 320.77 - License required of mobile home dealers.
- 320.771 - License required of recreational vehicle dealers.
- 320.822 - Definitions; ss. 320.822-320.862.
- 320.8232 - Establishment of uniform standards for used recreational vehicles and repair and remodeling code for mobile homes.
- 367.022 - Exemptions.
- 420.507 - Powers of the corporation.
- 420.5087 - State Apartment Incentive Loan Program.
- 420.5095 - Community Workforce Housing Innovation Pilot Program.
- 420.518 -
- 420.531 - Affordable Housing Catalyst Program.
- 420.9071 - Definitions.
- 420.9075 - Local housing assistance plans; partnerships.
- 420.9076 - Adoption of affordable housing incentive strategies; committees.
- 553.791 - Alternative plans review and inspection.
- 723.011 - Disclosure prior to rental of a mobile home lot; prospectus, filing, approval.
- 723.012 - Prospectus or offering circular.
- 723.023 - Mobile home owner’s general obligations.
- 723.031 - Mobile home lot rental agreements.
- 723.037 - Lot rental increases; reduction in services or utilities; change in rules and regulations; mediation.
- 723.041 - Entrance fees; refunds; exit fees prohibited; replacement homes.
- 723.042 - Provision of improvements.
- 723.059 - Rights of purchaser.
- 723.061 - Eviction; grounds, proceedings.
- 723.076 - Incorporation; notification of park owner.
- 723.078 - Bylaws of homeowners’ associations.
- 723.079 - Powers and duties of homeowners’ association.
- 723.1255 - Alternative resolution of recall disputes.
+ − Votes (3)
March 13, 2020: Floor vote: H 1339 e2
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 10
March 11, 2020: Floor vote: H 1339 e2
- Yeas: 39
March 9, 2020: Floor vote: H 1339 e1
- Yeas: 119