+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (44)
On September 21, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2020-174
On September 18, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On September 4, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 81 NAYS 31
- Concurred in 2 amendment(s) (112030, 319936)
- In returning messages
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 34 NAYS 5
- Amendment(s) adopted (112030, 319936)
- Amendment(s) failed (572656)
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Motion to reconsider adopted
- CS failed to pass; YEAS 18 NAYS 20
- Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1332
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Infrastructure and Security; Rules
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Infrastructure and Security; Rules
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 76 NAYS 41
- Read 3rd time
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (102637, 220279)
- Read 2nd time
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 7
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 01/30/20, 11:30 am, Morris Hall
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On December 18, 2019 in the House:
- Now in State Affairs Committee
On December 13, 2019 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On December 11, 2019 in the House:
- CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 2
On December 4, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 12/11/19, 12:30 pm, Webster Hall
On October 23, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Business and Professions Subcommittee
- Favorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 5
On October 16, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 10/23/19, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
On September 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
On September 10, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (9)
690679 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 12/11/2019)
Remove lines 357-375 and insert:
784927 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 12/11/2019)
Remove lines 456-471 and insert:
287035 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 1/30/2020)
Remove lines 83-223 and insert:
220279 - Amendment (House: Adopted 2/19/2020)
Remove lines 139-140 and insert:
102637 - Amendment (House: Adopted 2/19/2020)
Between lines 270 and 271, insert:
572656 - Amendment (Senate: Failed 3/13/2020)
Delete lines 153 - 207 and insert:
319936 - Amendment (House: Concur 3/13/2020)
Delete lines 232 - 240.
726480 - Amendment (Senate: Withdrawn 3/13/2020)
Between lines 330 and 331 insert:
112030 - Amendment (House: Concur 3/13/2020)
Delete lines 499 - 507 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 125.0103 - Ordinances and rules imposing price controls; findings required; procedures.
- 125.01047 -
- 166.043 - Ordinances and rules imposing price controls; findings required; procedures.
- 166.04465 -
- 323.002 - County and municipal wrecker operator systems; penalties for operation outside of system.
- 713.78 - Liens for recovering, towing, or storing vehicles and vessels.
- 715.07 - Vehicles or vessels parked on private property; towing.
+ − Votes (4)
March 13, 2020: Floor vote: H 133 e1
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 31
March 13, 2020: Floor vote: H 133 e1
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 5
March 11, 2020: Floor vote: H 133 e1
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 20
February 20, 2020: Floor vote: H 133 e1
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 41
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor