+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2015-133
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
- Approved by Governor
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
- Concurred in House amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) (056723)
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted (056723)
- Was taken up
- Concurred in Senate amendment(s) as amended (563852)
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 1
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- In returning messages
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- In returning messages
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (563852)
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/SB 1270
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
- In Messages
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/08/15
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/26/15, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
- CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/03/15, 4:30 pm, Morris Hall
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
- CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/10/15, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On December 19, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (7)
056723 - Amendment to Amendment (563852)
Remove lines 7-252 of the amendment and insert:
650255 - Amendment to Amendment (056723)
Between lines 4 and 5 of the amendment, insert:
155759 - Amendment to Amendment (563852)
Remove lines 7-260 of the amendment and insert:
563852 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
155464 - Amendment to Amendment (142782)
Delete line 165 and insert:
142782 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
578825 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (4)
April 29, 2015: Floor vote: H 0133 c1
- Yeas: 37
April 28, 2015: Floor vote: H 0133 c1
- Yeas: 117
- Nays: 1
April 24, 2015: Floor vote: H 0133 c1
- Yeas: 39
April 9, 2015: Floor vote: H 0133 c1
- Yeas: 115
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor