+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2017-219
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Rules
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Local Calendar, 05/04/17
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Rules
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 1
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/06/17, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Government Accountability Committee
- Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 12:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Health Quality Subcommittee
- Favorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/15/17, 8:00 am, 12 HOB
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Health Quality Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 2012-258 - Section 3
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2017: Floor vote: H 1317
- Yeas: 38
April 27, 2017: Floor vote: H 1317
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor