+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2021-72
On June 4, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 5
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Messages
- Referred to Rules
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Message sent to senate
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Rules
- Substituted for SB 7066
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 1
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- In Messages
- Ordered enrolled
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021)
- Bill referred to House Calendar
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported out of Commerce Committee
- Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- PCS added to Commerce Committee agenda
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Commerce Committee
- Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
- Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
- Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
- Referred to Commerce Committee
- Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee
- Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 286.011 - Public meetings and records; public inspection; criminal and civil penalties.
- 350.01 - Florida Public Service Commission; terms of commissioners; vacancies; election and duties of chair; quorum; proceedings.
- 364.183 - Access to company records.
- 366.093 - Public utility records; confidentiality.
- 367.156 - Public utility records; confidentiality.
- 368.108 - Confidentiality; discovery.
+ − Votes (2)
April 21, 2021: Floor vote: H 1311 c1
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 5
April 21, 2021: Floor vote: H 1311 c1
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor