+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on Table
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 27 NAYS 1
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/19/15, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/11/15, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (85)
- 17.61 - Chief Financial Officer; powers and duties in the investment of certain funds.
- 161.05301 - Beach erosion control project staffing.
- 161.054 - Administrative fines; liability for damage; liens.
- 161.091 - Beach management; funding; repair and maintenance strategy.
- 201.0205 - Counties that have implemented ch. 83-220; inapplicability of 10-cent tax increase by s. 2, ch. 92-317, Laws of Florida.
- 201.15 - Distribution of taxes collected.
- 211.3103 - Levy of tax on severance of phosphate rock; rate, basis, and distribution of tax.
- 215.20 - Certain income and certain trust funds to contribute to the General Revenue Fund.
- 215.618 - Bonds for acquisition and improvement of land, water areas, and related property interests and resources.
- 215.619 - Bonds for Everglades restoration.
- 253.027 - Emergency archaeological property acquisition.
- 253.03 - Board of trustees to administer state lands; lands enumerated.
- 253.034 - State-owned lands; uses.
- 253.7824 - Sale of products; proceeds.
- 258.015 - Citizen support organizations; use of property; audit.
- 258.435 - Use of aquatic preserves for the accommodation of visitors.
- 259.032 - Conservation and Recreation Lands Trust Fund; purpose.
- 259.035 - Acquisition and Restoration Council.
- 259.036 - Management review teams.
- 259.037 - Land Management Uniform Accounting Council.
- 259.04 - Board; powers and duties.
- 259.041 - Acquisition of state-owned lands for preservation, conservation, and recreation purposes.
- 259.101 - Florida Preservation 2000 Act.
- 259.105 - The Florida Forever Act.
- 259.1051 - Florida Forever Trust Fund.
- 287.0595 - Pollution response action contracts; department rules.
- 338.250 - Central Florida Beltway Mitigation.
- 339.0801 - Allocation of increased revenues derived from amendments to s. 319.32(5)(a) by ch. 2012-128.
- 339.2818 - Small County Outreach Program.
- 339.2819 - Transportation Regional Incentive Program.
- 339.55 - State-funded infrastructure bank.
- 339.61 - Florida Strategic Intermodal System; legislative findings, declaration, and intent.
- 341.051 - Administration and financing of public transit and intercity bus service programs and projects.
- 341.303 - Funding authorization and appropriations; eligibility and participation.
- 343.58 - County funding for the South Florida Regional Transportation Authority.
- 369.252 - Invasive plant control on public lands.
- 373.026 - General powers and duties of the department.
- 373.089 - Sale or exchange of lands, or interests or rights in lands.
- 373.129 - Maintenance of actions.
- 373.199 - Florida Forever Water Management District Work Plan.
- 373.430 - Prohibitions, violation, penalty, intent.
- 373.459 - Funds for surface water improvement and management.
- 373.4592 - Everglades improvement and management.
- 373.45926 - Everglades Trust Fund; allocation of revenues and expenditure of funds for conservation and protection of natural resources and abatement of water pollution.
- 373.470 - Everglades restoration.
- 373.584 - Revenue bonds.
- 373.59 - Water Management Lands Trust Fund.
- 373.5905 - Reinstatement of payments in lieu of taxes; duration.
- 373.703 - Water production; general powers and duties.
- 375.031 - Acquisition of land; procedures.
- 375.041 - Land Acquisition Trust Fund.
- 375.044 - Land Acquisition Trust Fund budget request.
- 375.045 - Florida Preservation 2000 Trust Fund.
- 375.051 - Issuance of revenue bonds subject to constitutional authorization.
- 375.075 - Outdoor recreation; financial assistance to local governments.
- 376.11 - Florida Coastal Protection Trust Fund.
- 376.123 - Claims against the Florida Coastal Protection Trust Fund.
- 376.307 - Water Quality Assurance Trust Fund.
- 376.40 - Petroleum exploration and production; purposes; funding.
- 379.202 - Conservation and Recreation Lands Program Trust Fund of the Fish and Wildlife Conservation Commission.
- 379.206 - Grants and Donations Trust Fund.
- 379.212 - Land Acquisition Trust Fund.
- 379.214 - Invasive Plant Control Trust Fund.
- 380.0666 - Powers of land authority.
- 380.0677 - Green Swamp Land Authority.
- 380.507 - Powers of the trust.
- 380.508 - Projects; development, review, and approval.
- 380.510 - Conditions of grants and loans.
- 380.511 - Florida Communities Trust Fund.
- 403.0615 - Water resources restoration and preservation.
- 403.08601 - Leah Schad Memorial Ocean Outfall Program.
- 403.121 - Enforcement; procedure; remedies.
- 403.1651 - Ecosystem Management and Restoration Trust Fund.
- 403.885 - Water Projects Grant Program.
- 403.8911 - Annual appropriation from the Water Protection and Sustainability Program Trust Fund.
- 403.9325 - Definitions.
- 403.93345 - Coral reef protection.
- 420.5092 - Florida Affordable Housing Guarantee Program.
- 420.9073 - Local housing distributions.
- 420.9079 - Local Government Housing Trust Fund.
- 570.207 - Conservation and Recreation Lands Program Trust Fund of the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services.
- 570.321 - Plant Industry Trust Fund.
- 570.71 - Conservation easements and agreements.
- 895.09 - Disposition of funds obtained through forfeiture proceedings.
- 373.1391 - Management of real property.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor