+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Health Policy
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Health Policy; Rules
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 1
- Read 3rd time
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/04/17
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
- CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/16/17, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Health and Human Services Committee
- CS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
- Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 02/22/17, 8:00 am, Mashburn Hall
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
576193 - Amendment
Remove lines 57-85 and insert:
134519 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Vote
April 5, 2017: Floor vote: H 129 c2
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor