+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/16/13, 2:00 pm, Reed Hall
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Economic Affairs Committee
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 04/09/13, 10:30 am, Webster Hall
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
- Favorable by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, 03/27/13, 4:30 pm, 404 HOB
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Economic Affairs Committee
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
710169 - Amendment
04/24/2013 at 1:18 PM
383049 - Amendment
Remove line 20 and insert:
420195 - Amendment
Remove lines 16-20 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 163.01 - Florida Interlocal Cooperation Act of 1969.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor