+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2013-266
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Withdrawn from Rules
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Messages
- Referred to Rules
- Placed on Local Calendar, 04/30/13
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/13
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/09/13, 2:30 pm, Morris Hall
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Now in State Affairs Committee
- Favorable by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 04/04/13, 10:30 am, Webster Hall
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2013: Senate floor vote on H 1287
- Yeas: 36
April 30, 2013: Floor Vote: Senate
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (2)
LaRosa
Type:
Primary Sponsor