+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Rules
- In Messages
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/19/17, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Government Accountability Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 03/29/17, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; Government Accountability Committee
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 5, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendment
895021 - Amendment
Remove lines 25-141 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
April 26, 2017: Floor vote: H 1285 c1
- Yeas: 118
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor