+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1300 (Ch. 2014-100), CS/CS/SB 1308 (Ch. 2014-101)
- Substituted CS/CS/SB 1300
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/14
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/10/14, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- CS/CS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- CS/CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/31/14, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
- CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/19/14, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 2, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
255493 - Amendment
Remove line 37 and insert:
253877 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 624.4212 -