+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Statute Amended
- 320.08056 - Specialty license plates.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor