+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2015-198
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Withdrawn from Rules
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Local Calendar, 04/29/15
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed; YEAS 98 NAYS 19
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Messages
- Referred to Rules
- Received
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/15
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable by- Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 04/09/15, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 03/25/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
On March 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2015: Floor vote: H 1213
- Yeas: 40
April 24, 2015: Floor vote: H 1213
- Yeas: 116
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor