+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (40)
On July 1, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2020-160, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 115 (Ch. 2020-125), CS/CS/CS/HB 713 (Ch. 2020-133)
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) adopted (380064)
- Withdrawn from Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 474
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- In returning messages
- Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (380064)
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 103 NAYS 11
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations
- In Messages
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 88 NAYS 25
- Amendment(s) adopted (060661)
- Read 3rd time
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (672911)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
- Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Now in Commerce Committee
- Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 2
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Now in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 3
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 12:30 pm, Webster Hall
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (10)
122033 - Strike All Amendment (Adopted without Objection 2/20/2020)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
672911 - Strike All Amendment (House: Adopted 3/6/2020)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
967981 - Amendment to Amendment (672911) (House: Withdrawn 3/6/2020)
Remove lines 197-220 of the amendment
078645 - Amendment to Amendment (672911) (House: Withdrawn 3/5/2020)
Between lines 2325 and 2326 of the amendment, insert:
881973 - Strike All Amendment (House: Withdrawn 3/5/2020)
Between lines 2830 and 2831, insert:
300173 - Strike All Amendment (House: Withdrawn 3/5/2020)
Between lines 2830 and 2831, insert:
060661 - Amendment (House: Adopted 3/9/2020)
Remove lines 420-443 and insert:
828936 - Amendment (Senate: Replaced by Engrossed Amendment 3/12/2020)
Delete lines 234 - 2565 and insert:
338142 - Amendment to Amendment (828936) (Senate: Replaced by Engrossed Amendment 3/12/2020)
Delete lines 828 - 829 and insert:
380064 - Amendment (House: Concur 3/12/2020)
Delete lines 234 - 2565 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (82)
- 287.055 - Acquisition of professional architectural, engineering, landscape architectural, or surveying and mapping services; definitions; procedures; contingent fees prohibited; penalties.
- 322.57 - Tests of knowledge concerning specified vehicles; endorsement; nonresidents; violations.
- 326.004 - Licensing.
- 447.02 - Definitions.
- 447.04 - Business agents; licenses, permits.
- 447.041 - Hearings.
- 447.045 - Information confidential.
- 447.06 - Registration of labor organizations required.
- 447.09 - Right of franchise preserved; penalties.
- 447.12 - Fees for registration.
- 447.16 - Applicability of chapter.
- 447.305 - Registration of employee organization.
- 455.213 - General licensing provisions.
- 455.2278 -
- 456.072 - Grounds for discipline; penalties; enforcement.
- 456.0721 - Practitioners in default on student loan or scholarship obligations; investigation; report.
- 456.074 - Certain health care practitioners; immediate suspension of license.
- 468.505 - Exemptions; exceptions.
- 468.603 - Definitions.
- 468.609 - Administration of this part; standards for certification; additional categories of certification.
- 468.613 - Certification by endorsement.
- 468.8314 - Licensure.
- 471.015 - Licensure.
- 473.308 - Licensure.
- 474.202 - Definitions.
- 474.203 - Exemptions.
- 474.207 - Licensure by examination.
- 474.217 - Licensure by endorsement.
- 476.114 - Examination; prerequisites.
- 476.144 - Licensure.
- 477.013 - Definitions.
- 477.0132 - Hair braiding, hair wrapping, and body wrapping registration.
- 477.0135 - Exemptions.
- 477.019 - Cosmetologists; qualifications; licensure; supervised practice; license renewal; endorsement; continuing education.
- 477.0201 - Specialty registration; qualifications; registration renewal; endorsement.
- 477.026 - Fees; disposition.
- 477.0263 - Cosmetology services to be performed in licensed salon; exceptions.
- 477.0265 - Prohibited acts.
- 477.029 - Penalty.
- 481.201 - Purpose.
- 481.203 - Definitions.
- 481.205 - Board of Architecture and Interior Design.
- 481.207 - Fees.
- 481.209 - Examinations.
- 481.213 - Licensure.
- 481.2131 - Interior design; practice requirements; disclosure of compensation for professional services.
- 481.215 - Renewal of license.
- 481.217 - Inactive status.
- 481.219 - Certification of partnerships, limited liability companies, and corporations.
- 481.221 - Seals; display of certificate number.
- 481.223 - Prohibitions; penalties; injunctive relief.
- 481.2251 - Disciplinary proceedings against registered interior designers.
- 481.229 - Exceptions; exemptions from licensure.
- 481.231 - Effect of part locally.
- 481.303 - Definitions.
- 481.310 - Practical experience requirement.
- 481.311 - Licensure.
- 481.313 - Renewal of license.
- 481.317 - Temporary certificates.
- 481.319 - Corporate and partnership practice of landscape architecture; certificate of authorization.
- 481.321 - Seals; display of certificate number.
- 481.329 - Exceptions; exemptions from licensure.
- 489.103 - Exemptions.
- 489.111 - Licensure by examination.
- 489.113 - Qualifications for practice; restrictions.
- 489.115 - Certification and registration; endorsement; reciprocity; renewals; continuing education.
- 489.511 - Certification; application; examinations; endorsement.
- 489.517 - Renewal of certificate or registration; continuing education.
- 489.518 - Alarm system agents.
- 492.104 - Rulemaking authority.
- 492.108 - Licensure by endorsement; requirements; fees.
- 492.111 - Practice of professional geology by a firm, corporation, or partnership; certificate of authorization.
- 492.113 - Disciplinary proceedings.
- 492.115 - Roster of licensed professional geologists.
- 509.102 -
- 548.003 - Florida State Boxing Commission.
- 548.017 - Participants, managers, and other persons required to have licenses.
- 553.5141 - Certifications of conformity and remediation plans.
- 553.74 - Florida Building Commission.
- 558.002 - Definitions.
- 725.08 - Design professional contracts; limitation in indemnification.
- 823.15 - Dogs and cats released from animal shelters or animal control agencies; sterilization requirement.
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 2020: Floor vote: H 1193 e2
- Yeas: 103
- Nays: 11
March 12, 2020: Floor vote: H 1193 e2
- Yeas: 38
March 9, 2020: Floor vote: H 1193 e1
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 25