+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2013-209
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
- Ordered enrolled
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Messages
- Received
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1408
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
- Ordered enrolled
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (607153)
- Read 2nd time
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/13
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/04/13, 10:30 am, 404 HOB
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee
- CS referred to Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Original reference(s) removed: Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- PCS on Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/19/13, 1:00 pm, 404 HOB
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
607153 - Amendment
04/25/2013 at 1:23 PM
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- 628.901 - Definitions.
- 628.905 - Licensing; authority.
- 628.907 - Minimum capital and net assets requirements; restriction on payment of dividends.
- 628.909 - Applicability of other laws.
- 628.9142 - Reinsurance; effect on reserves.
- 628.915 - Exemption from compulsory association.
- 628.917 - Insolvency and liquidation.
- 628.919 - Standards to ensure risk management control by parent company.
- 628.908 - Surplus requirements; restriction on payment of dividends.
- 628.910 - Incorporation options and requirements.
- 628.921 -
+ − Votes (4)
April 29, 2013: House floor vote on H 1191 e1
- Yeas: 116
April 29, 2013: Floor Vote: House
- Yeas: 116
April 29, 2013: Senate floor vote on H 1191 e1
- Yeas: 38
April 29, 2013: Floor Vote: Senate
- Yeas: 38
+ − Sponsors (2)
Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Type:
Primary Sponsor