+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 92 (Ch. 2013-33)
- Substituted CS/CS/SB 92
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/13
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/14/13, 9:00 am, 404 HOB
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
- Now in Judiciary Committee
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/07/13, 4:00 pm, Webster Hall
- Introduced
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/07/13, 2:00 pm, 404 HOB
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
953467 - Amendment
Remove lines 41-45 and insert:
048597 - Amendment
Remove lines 32-36 and insert:
221021 - Amendment
Remove line 28 and insert:
+ − Sponsors (5)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor