+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1050 (Ch. 2020-36)
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
- CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Now in State Affairs Committee
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 27 NAYS 0
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/11/20, 4:00 pm, Webster Hall
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- CS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
- CS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
669163 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 1/29/2020)
Remove line 25 and insert:
039319 - Strike All Amendment (Adopted without Objection 2/27/2020)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 110.120 - Administrative leave for disaster service volunteers.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor