+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- PCS on Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/03/16, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 775.0201 -
- 775.32 -
- 796.04 - Forcing, compelling, or coercing another to become a prostitute.
- 943.0435 - Sexual offenders required to register with the department; penalty.
- 944.606 - Sexual offenders; notification upon release.
- 948.33 -
- 794.0115 - Dangerous sexual felony offender; mandatory sentencing.
- 948.001 - Definitions.
- 948.30 - Additional terms and conditions of probation or community control for certain sex offenses.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor