+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 714 (Ch. 2021-100)
- Substituted CS/CS/SB 714
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/15/2021)
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
- Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Original reference removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
- Now in Health & Human Services Committee
- Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
On December 23, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
414823 - Strike All Amendment (Adopted without Objection 3/8/2021)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
774463 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 3/18/2021)
Between lines 63 and 64, insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 393.065 - Application and eligibility determination.
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor