+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/17
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- CS/CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
- CS/CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/13/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
- CS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- CS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/03/17, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- PCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (6)
425757 - Amendment
Remove lines 52-53 and insert:
757197 - Amendment
Remove lines 89-92 and insert:
285021 - Amendment
Remove line 118 and insert:
906651 - Amendment
Between lines 255 and 256, insert:
199599 - Amendment
Remove lines 74-247 and insert:
931831 - Amendment
Remove line 43 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor