+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/16/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Health and Human Services Committee
- Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/09/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 456.013 - Department; general licensing provisions.
- 458.310 - Restricted licenses.
- 458.3105 -
- 458.311 - Licensure by examination; requirements; fees.
- 458.319 - Renewal of license.
- 459.00751 -
- 459.00752 -
- 459.008 - Renewal of licenses and certificates.
- 766.1115 - Health care providers; creation of agency relationship with governmental contractors.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor