+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
- Referred to State Affairs Committee
- Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
- Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
- Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 282.32 -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor