+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1606 (Ch. 2020-63)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/13/20, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Now in Commerce Committee
- Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
- Now in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (4)
678807 - Strike All Amendment (Adopted without Objection 1/28/2020)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
738959 - Strike All Amendment (Adopted without Objection 2/13/2020)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
220563 - Amendment to Amendment (738959) (Withdrawn 2/13/2020)
Remove lines 167-215 of the amendment and insert:
685251 - Amendment
Between lines 173 and 174, insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (31)
- 319.30 - Definitions; dismantling, destruction, change of identity of motor vehicle or mobile home; salvage.
- 501.0051 - Protected consumer report security freeze.
- 624.307 - General powers; duties.
- 626.112 - License and appointment required; agents, customer representatives, adjusters, insurance agencies, service representatives, managing general agents.
- 626.602 - Insurance agency names; disapproval.
- 626.621 - Grounds for discretionary refusal, suspension, or revocation of agent’s, adjuster’s, customer representative’s, service representative’s, or managing general agent’s license or appointment.
- 626.782 - “Industrial class insurer” defined.
- 626.783 - “Ordinary-combination class insurer” defined.
- 626.796 - Representing another insurer in same industrial debit territory.
- 626.8443 - Duration of suspension or revocation.
- 626.854 - “Public adjuster” defined; prohibitions.
- 626.856 - “Company employee adjuster” defined.
- 626.916 - Eligibility for export.
- 626.9541 - Unfair methods of competition and unfair or deceptive acts or practices defined.
- 626.9741 - Use of credit reports and credit scores by insurers.
- 626.9957 - Conduct prohibited; denial, revocation, or suspension of registration.
- 627.062 - Rate standards.
- 627.421 - Delivery of policy.
- 627.502 - “Industrial life insurance” defined; reporting.
- 627.70131 - Insurer’s duty to acknowledge communications regarding claims; investigation.
- 627.7031 -
- 627.7142 - Homeowner Claims Bill of Rights.
- 627.715 - Flood insurance.
- 631.57 - Powers and duties of the association.
- 648.30 - Licensure and appointment required.
- 717.124 - Unclaimed property claims.
- 717.12404 - Claims on behalf of a business entity or trust.
- 717.1315 - Retention of records by claimant’s representatives and buyers of unclaimed property.
- 717.1322 - Administrative and civil enforcement.
- 717.135 - Power of attorney to recover reported property in the custody of the department.
- 717.1351 - Acquisition of unclaimed property.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor