+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2018-177
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Rules
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Local Calendar, 03/08/18
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- In Messages
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/08/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Now in Government Accountability Committee
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB
- Now in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/24/18, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
On January 2, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendment
656857 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2018: Floor vote: H 1117 c1
- Yeas: 38
March 1, 2018: Floor vote: H 1117 c1
- Yeas: 113
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor