+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1054 (Ch. 2022-17)
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Bill released to House Calendar
- Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
- Favorable by Education & Employment Committee
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Education & Employment Committee
- Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable by Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
- Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
- Reported out of Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee agenda
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
- Referred to Education & Employment Committee
- Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
- Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
On January 3, 2022 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor