+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in Commerce and Tourism
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
- In Messages
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 97 NAYS 16
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/14
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/04/14, 9:30 am, Reed Hall
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Economic Affairs Committee
- Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/25/14, 11:30 am, Webster Hall
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, 03/18/14, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 190.0121 -
+ − Vote
April 23, 2014: Floor vote: H 1083
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor