+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall --Temporarily postponed
On March 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
924253 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 768.73 - Punitive damages; limitation.