+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died on Calendar
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1686
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Regulated Industries; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
- Placed on 3rd reading
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
- In Messages
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/13
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
- CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time
- Placed on Calendar
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/09/13, 10:30 am, 404 HOB
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 03/27/13, 2:00 pm, 404 HOB --Not considered
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/20/13, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee, 03/12/13, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
627112 - Amendment
05/03/2013 at 2:20 PM (Late Filed)
466133 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- 548.002 - Definitions.
- 548.004 - Executive director; duties, compensation, administrative support.
- 548.006 - Power of commission to control professional and amateur pugilistic contests and exhibitions; certification of competitiveness of professional mixed martial arts and kickboxing matches.
- 548.007 - Applicability of provisions to amateur matches and certain other matches or events.
- 548.015 - Concessionaires; security.
- 548.017 - Participants, managers, and other persons required to have licenses.
- 548.046 - Physician’s attendance at match; examinations; cancellation of match.
- 548.054 - Withholding of purses; hearing; disposition of withheld purse forfeiture.
- 548.06 - Payments to state; exemptions.
- 548.07 - Suspension of license or permit by commissioner; hearing.
- 548.073 - Commission hearings.
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2013: House floor vote on H 1067 c1
- Yeas: 116
April 24, 2013: Floor Vote: House
- Yeas: 116
+ − Sponsors (4)
Regulatory Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor