+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2020-136
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for SB 1042
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Environment and Natural Resources; Rules
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Rules
- In Messages
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 1
- Read 3rd time
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Now in State Affairs Committee
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
- CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Now in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 12:00 pm, 12 HOB
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
On December 30, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
609961 - Strike All Amendment (Adopted without Objection 2/11/2020)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
766741 - Strike All Amendment (Adopted without Objection 2/27/2020)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 258.3991 -
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2020: Floor vote: H 1061 c2
- Yeas: 39
March 9, 2020: Floor vote: H 1061 c2
- Yeas: 117
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor