+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/11/14, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
- Favorable by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 1
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/03/14, 2:30 pm, Morris Hall
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Now in State Affairs Committee
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 01/14/14, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On November 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee
On September 27, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
280479 - Amendment
Between lines 173 and 174, insert:
948735 - Amendment
Remove lines 58-64
570291 - Amendment
Remove lines 62-64 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 509.092 - Public lodging establishments and public food service establishments; rights as private enterprises.
- 760.01 - Purposes; construction; title.
- 760.02 - Definitions.
- 760.05 - Functions of the commission.
- 760.07 - Remedies for unlawful discrimination.
- 760.08 - Discrimination in places of public accommodation.
- 760.10 - Unlawful employment practices.
- 760.11 - Administrative and civil remedies; construction.
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor