+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/27/13, 8:00 am, 404 HOB
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
854809 - Amendment
Remove lines 18-111 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Type:
Primary Sponsor