+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Health and Human Services Committee
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/20/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall --Temporarily Postponed
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
- Now in Health and Human Services Committee
- CS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
- Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 7
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/15/17, 9:00 am, Mashburn Hall
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
868807 - Amendment
Remove lines 56-381 and insert:
857955 - Amendment
Remove line 389 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 463.002 - Definitions.
- 463.005 - Authority of the board.
- 463.0055 - Administration and prescription of ocular pharmaceutical agents.
- 463.0056 -
- 463.007 - Renewal of license; continuing education.
- 463.009 - Supportive personnel.
- 463.013 - Optometric services for certain public agencies.
- 463.0135 - Standards of practice.
- 463.014 - Certain acts prohibited.
- 641.31 - Health maintenance contracts.
+ − Sponsor
Diaz, M.
Type:
Primary Sponsor