+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/08/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
- Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/25/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/16/15, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On March 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
573725 - Amendment
Remove lines 19-38 and insert: