+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2017-180
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 2
- Read 3rd time
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for SB 1228
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Messages
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations
- Received
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/19/17, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Government Accountability Committee
- Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- Favorable by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 03/14/17, 2:00 pm, 12 HOB
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 921.0022 - Criminal Punishment Code; offense severity ranking chart.
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2017: Floor vote: H 1031
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 2
April 26, 2017: Floor vote: H 1031
- Yeas: 117