+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2017-149
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
- Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (483650)
- In returning messages
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 34 NAYS 2
- Read 3rd time
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Community Affairs; Appropriations; Rules
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1312
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (483650)
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Community Affairs; Appropriations; Rules
- In Messages
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed; YEAS 119 NAYS 0
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17
- Placed on Calendar
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 29 NAYS 0
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/06/17, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Commerce Committee
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/29/17, 11:30 am, Webster Hall
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Favorable by Careers and Competition Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Careers and Competition Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Commerce Committee
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (15)
416182 - Amendment
Delete lines 112 - 319 and insert:
493672 - Amendment to Amendment (416182)
Delete lines 24 - 50 and insert:
213876 - Amendment to Amendment (416182)
Delete lines 51 - 80 and insert:
483650 - Amendment
Delete lines 112 - 319 and insert:
548880 - Amendment to Amendment (483650)
Delete lines 24 - 50 and insert:
480873 - Amendment
Remove lines 57-106 and insert:
435091 - Amendment
Between lines 106 and 107, insert:
170485 - Amendment
Between lines 106 and 107, insert:
163111 - Amendment
Between lines 137 and 138, insert:
389625 - Amendment
Remove lines 159-168 and insert:
152005 - Amendment
Remove lines 171-181 and insert:
407873 - Amendment
Remove lines 237-272 and insert:
929977 - Amendment
Between lines 272 and 273, insert:
222731 - Amendment
Remove lines 106-155
260039 - Amendment
Between lines 155 and 156, insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (17)
- 377.705 - Solar Energy Center; development of solar energy standards.
- 553.721 - Surcharge.
- 553.80 - Enforcement.
- 553.9081 -
- 633.208 - Minimum firesafety standards.
- 553.79 - Permits; applications; issuance; inspections.
- 471.033 - Disciplinary proceedings.
- 489.103 - Exemptions.
- 553.791 - Alternative plans review and inspection.
- 468.603 - Definitions.
- 468.609 - Administration of this part; standards for certification; additional categories of certification.
- 468.617 - Joint building code inspection department; other arrangements.
- 471.045 - Professional engineers performing building code inspector duties.
- 481.222 - Architects performing building code inspection services.
- 489.516 - Qualifications to practice; restrictions; prerequisites.
- 553.73 - Florida Building Code.
- 553.76 - General powers of the commission.
+ − Votes (3)
May 5, 2017: Floor vote: H 1021 c2
- Yeas: 116
May 5, 2017: Floor vote: H 1021 c2
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 2
April 19, 2017: Floor vote: H 1021 c2
- Yeas: 119
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor