+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- CS/CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 2
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/09/13, 2:30 pm, Reed Hall
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee read 1st time
- Now in Economic Affairs Committee
- CS referred to Economic Affairs Committee
- Original reference(s) removed: Civil Justice Subcommittee
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, 03/27/13, 4:30 pm, 404 HOB
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
413201 - Amendment
Remove line 37 and insert:
868959 - Amendment
Remove lines 17-51 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 316.3045 - Operation of radios or other mechanical soundmaking devices or instruments in vehicles; exemptions.
+ − Sponsors (4)
Economic Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor