+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2013-259, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 954 (Ch. 2013-235)
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Withdrawn from Rules
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Messages
- Referred to Rules
- Placed on Local Calendar, 04/30/13
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/13
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/03/13, 9:30 am, Reed Hall
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Economic Affairs Committee
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/14/13, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Economic Affairs Committee
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
864007 - Amendment
Remove lines 24-28
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2013: Senate floor vote on H 1013 c1
- Yeas: 36
April 30, 2013: Floor Vote: Senate
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (2)
Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor